VA HB2422 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0648)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0648)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance institutions and agents; notice of financial information collection and disclosure practices. Creates an exemption from the requirement that insurance institutions and agents provide policyholders with an annual notice of financial information collection and disclosure practices in connection with insurance transactions. The exemption applies when the insurance institution or agent provides nonpublic personal information to nonaffiliated third parties only in accordance with ยง 38.2-613 and has not changed its policies and practices with regard to disclosing nonpublic financial information from the policies and practices that were disclosed in the most recent notice sent to the policyholder.
Title
Insurance institution or agent; notice of financial information collection and disclosure practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0648) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 648 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2422ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 17104490D-E |
2017-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2422E |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104490D |