VA HB2462 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certain misdemeanor offenses by minors. Provides that in the case of a misdemeanor violation of §18.2-250.1 (possession of marijuana) and §18.2-266.1 (underage drinking and driving) a petition need not be filed if the juvenile is released to the custody of a parent or legal guardian pending the initial court date. Current law provides that no petition need be filed in the case of any violation of §18.2-266 (DUI) or 29.1-738 (drunk boating). A procedure is established making it possible for a juvenile to have a misdemeanor possession of marijuana charge referred to intake for consideration of informal proceedings.
Title
Juveniles; filing of petition not necessary for certain misdemeanor offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 1-N) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 90-N) (Y: 5 N: 92 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 1-N) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 90-N) (Y: 5 N: 92 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 825 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB2462ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (100-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-22 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2462ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-26 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-26 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-26 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senators: Reynolds, Deeds, Stuart | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House: Delegates: Habeeb, Janis, Barlow | |
2011-02-24 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2011-02-24 | House: House acceded to request | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 90-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Senate amendments rejected by House (5-Y 90-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-20 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11104459D |