VA HB2486 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0281)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0281)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Plan for impaired waters. Requires that the plan developed and implemented to restore impaired waters be controlling unless it is amended or withdrawn by the State Water Control Board.
Title
Impaired waters; requires plan developed and implemented to restore waters be controlling.
Sponsors
Del. John Cox [R] | Del. Edward Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 71 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 71 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0281) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 281 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2486ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (69-Y 30-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 6-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-21 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11104109D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1441 (Same As) 2011-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)