VA HB2522 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; annual mixed beverage special events licenses; combined annual mixed beverage special events and mixed beverage caterer's licenses; agritourism resorts. Allows "agritourism resorts," as defined in the bill, to obtain annual mixed beverage special events licenses, which authorize such resorts to (i) sell alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption in areas upon the licensed premises approved by the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority and (ii) permit the consumption of lawfully acquired alcoholic beverages by persons to whom overnight lodging is being provided in bedrooms and private guest rooms. The bill also creates a combined annual mixed beverage special events and mixed beverage caterer's license, which may be granted to any agritourism resort that meets the licensure qualifications for both licenses for the same business premises, and authorizes the agritourism resort to maintain a common alcoholic beverage inventory for purposes of both licensed operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; annual mixed beverage special events licenses, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in General Laws
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102856D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41100(n/a)See Bill Text
41210(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback