VA HB2534 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Science and Technology
Pending: House Science and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Science and Technology
Pending: House Science and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Information Technologies Agency; required information security training program for state employees. Requires the Chief Information Officer of the Virginia Information Technologies Agency (the CIO) to develop and annually update a curriculum and materials for training all state employees in information security awareness and in proper procedures for detecting, assessing, reporting, and addressing information security threats by November 1, 2019. The bill requires every state agency, beginning January 1, 2020, to provide annual information security training for each of its employees using the curriculum and materials developed by the CIO.
Title
VITA; required information security training program for state employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Science and Technology |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101789D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2534 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2534+hil |