VA HB2594 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic incident management vehicles. Adds traffic incident management vehicles, defined in the bill, when operated by persons who meet certain training requirements, to a list of vehicles exempt from certain traffic regulations when responding to an emergency. The bill also allows such vehicles to be equipped with flashing red or red and white secondary warning lights and sirens.
Title
Traffic incident management vehicles; definition.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 7-N) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2594H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105422D-H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105422D-H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104407D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1023 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1029.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 920 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |