VA HB2625 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Recounts; rules of procedure; multiple simultaneous recounts. Requires a recount court to issue a written order setting out the rules of procedures fixed by it for the conduct of a recount prior to the commencement of such recount. The bill also directs the State Board of Elections to promulgate standards and instructions for conducting simultaneous recounts of two or more elections in a single election district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recounts; rules of procedure, multiple simultaneous recounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382)
2019-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 382 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2625ER)
2019-02-20HouseEnrolled
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 19103933D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242800(n/a)See Bill Text
242802(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback