VA HB2637 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0552)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0552)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Loans and grants for agricultural best management practices; riparian buffers. Authorizes the State Water Control Board to issue loans and grants from the Virginia Water Facilities Revolving Fund for the construction, renovation, improvement, or equipping of facilities or structures to implement agricultural best management practices to prevent pollution of state waters. Current law authorizes the Board to only issue loans for the construction of such facilities. The bill includes among the types of facilities or structures for which a loan or grant may be issued riparian buffers planted in trees and maintained in accordance with the terms and conditions of the loan or grant.
Title
Loans and grants for agricultural best management practices; riparian buffers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0552) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 552 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2637ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19102217D |