VA HB271 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Public schools; school resource officers; data. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services, in coordination with the Department of Education and the Department of Juvenile Justice, to annually collect, report, and publish data related to incidents involving students and school resource officers. The bill also requires the Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety to analyze and disseminate submitted data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public schools; school resource officers and school security officers, data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21SenatePassed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-21SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-21SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-21SenateRead third time
2020-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateReported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-04HouseVOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N)
2020-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N)
2020-02-03HousePrinted as engrossed 20102227D-E
2020-02-03HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB271E
2020-02-03HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-03HouseRead second time
2020-01-31HouseRead first time
2020-01-29HouseReported from Education with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 1-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2019-12-30HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-12-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102227D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221279.10(n/a)See Bill Text
91184(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback