VA HB2733 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0259)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Personal property tax; exemption for agricultural vehicles. Provides that, for purposes of the optional local personal property tax exemptions for motor vehicles, trucks, and tractors, the exemption shall apply if the vehicle is used primarily for agricultural purposes. Under current law, the exemption applies only if the vehicle is used exclusively for agricultural purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal property tax; exemption for agricultural vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0259)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 259 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2733ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19102936D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2733E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 19102936D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813505(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2733
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2733+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2733E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2733ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0259+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1002V0011+HB2733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H10V0078+HB2733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2335+HB2733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0325+HB2733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2733+HB2733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2733+HB2733

Bill Comments

feedback