VA HB2747 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0555)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Southwest Virginia Energy Research and Development Authority. Creates the Southwest Virginia Energy Research and Development Authority (the Authority) to promote opportunities for energy development in Southwest Virginia, to create jobs and economic activity in Southwest Virginia consistent with the Virginia Energy Plan, and to position Southwest Virginia and the Commonwealth as a leader in energy workforce and energy technology research and development. The Authority will be composed of 11 nonlegislative members, of whom four will be appointed by the Governor, four will be appointed by the Speaker of the House, and three will be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. The Authority is charged with, among other tasks, (i) leveraging the strength in energy research and workforce development of Virginia's public and private institutions of higher education; (ii) supporting the development of pump storage hydropower in Southwest Virginia and energy storage generally; (iii) promoting the development of renewable energy generation facilities on brownfield sites, including abandoned mine sites; (iv) promoting energy workforce development; and (v) assisting energy technology research and development by promoting the development of a Southwest Virginia Energy Park. The bill has a sunset date of July 1, 2029. This bill is identical to SB 1707.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Southwest Virginia Energy Research and Development Authority; created, sunset provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0555)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 555 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2747ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Chafin, Cosgrove, Saslaw
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: Kilgore, Pillion, Torian
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-20HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-19SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-19SenateSenate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 97-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-14SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-14SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2747H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106386D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106386D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 19104409D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2747
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2747+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2747H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2747ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0555+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0075+HB2747
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0201V0017+HB2747
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0072+HB2747
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2413+HB2747
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0155+HB2747
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2747+HB2747
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2747+HB2747
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2923+HB2747
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0792HB2747+HB2747
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3268+HB2747
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1033HB2747+HB2747

Bill Comments

feedback