VA HB29 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
Summary
Budget Bill. Amending Chapter 665 of the 2015 Acts of Assembly.
Title
Budget Bill.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED #2 (0-Y 94-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 91-N) (Y: 1 N: 94 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with Senate amendments substituted for House amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED #2 (0-Y 94-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 91-N) (Y: 1 N: 94 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with Senate amendments substituted for House amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732) | |
2016-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 732 (effective 4/10/16) | |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB29ER) |
2016-03-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/28/16 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB29ER) |
2016-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2016-03-11 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senators: Norment, Hanger, Howell, Saslaw, Newman, Ruff, Wagner |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Delegates: Jones, Cox, Landes, O'Bannon, Greason, Torian |
2016-03-02 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2016-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | VOTE: REJECTED #2 (0-Y 94-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 94-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Reconsideration of Senate amendments rejected by House |
2016-03-02 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 91-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (1-Y 91-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance with Senate amendments substituted for House amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Constitutional reading dispensed (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-02-25 | House | Motion to pass by contested committee amendment Item 3-6.05 #1h agreed to |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 34-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Contested committee amendment Item 290 #1h agreed to (65-Y 34-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Uncontested Committee amendments agreed to (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-24 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | House | Motion for Special and Continuing Order (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Budget amendments available |
2016-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103288D |