VA HB299 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
License tax; retired police or military dogs; exemption. Allows a locality by ordinance to exempt any dog that served as a police or law-enforcement dog or military working dog from the license tax on the ownership of dogs. Such ordinance must include a verification process for the vaccination records of such a dog. License tax; retired police or military dogs; exemption. Allows a locality by ordinance to exempt any dog that served as a police or law-enforcement dog or military working dog from the license tax on the ownership of dogs. Such ordinance must include a verification process for the vaccination records of such a dog.
Title
License tax; retired police or military dogs, exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187) | |
2024-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 187 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB299ER) |
2024-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-30 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 24102274D-E |
2024-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB299E |
2024-01-29 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102274D |