VA HB323 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local Food and Farming Infrastructure Grant Program. Increases from $25,000 to $50,000 the amount of a grant that may be made to a political subdivision for projects that support local food production and sustainable agriculture.
Title
Local Food and Farming Infrastructure Grant Program; increases grant for certain projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 287 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB323ER) |
2022-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102179D |