VA HB323 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Continued to 2025 in Health and Human Services by voice vote
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Continued to 2025 in Health and Human Services by voice vote
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Interstate Massage Compact. Authorizes Virginia to become a signatory to the Interstate Massage Compact. The Compact allows massage therapists who (i) possess an active, unencumbered license in the compact member state in which they reside; (ii) have completed at least 625 hours of massage therapy education; (iii) have passed the national licensing examination; and (iv) have no disqualifying criminal history to be granted a multistate license that authorizes them to practice in all compact member states. The Compact takes effect when it is enacted by a seventh member state.
Title
Interstate Massage Compact; authorizes Virginia to become a signatory to Compact.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Continued to 2025 in Health and Human Services by voice vote |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 with amendment(s) by voice vote |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned sub: Health Professions |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101348D |