VA HB344 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth; campus free speech; policies, materials, and reports. Requires each public institution of higher education in the Commonwealth to (i) establish and include in its student handbook, on its website, and in its student orientation programs policies regarding speech that is protected under the First Amendment and the process to report incidents of disruption of such speech; (ii) develop materials on such policies and notify any employee who is responsible for the discipline or education of enrolled students of such materials; and (iii) develop, post on its website in a searchable, publicly accessible, and conspicuous manner, and submit to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health no later than December 1 of each year a report on the institution's compliance relating to free speech on campus.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; constitutionally protected speech, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Daniel Marshall [R] |
Del. Charles Poindexter [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751) | |
2018-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 751 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB344ER) |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107473D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB344S1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107473D-S1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107473D-S1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (89-Y 8-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB344H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Substitute by Delegate Toscano withdrawn 18106245D-H2 |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105668D-H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-29 | House | Floor substitute printed 18106245D-H2 (Toscano) |
2018-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105668D-H1 |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100379D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1 | 401.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 900.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |