VA HB36 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; guidelines for policies on concussions in student-athletes. Requires the Board of Education to update its guidelines for school board policies on concussions in student-athletes to include in information provided to coaches, student-athletes, and student-athletes' parents or guardians the effects of concussions on student-athletes' academic performance.
Title
Student-athletes; Board of Education to update its guidelines for policies on concussions.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Education |
2014-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2013-12-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-12-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100637D |