VA HB394 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers to the Port Opportunity Fund. Creates an exception to an annually determined transfer to the Port Opportunity Fund if the Secretary of Transportation determines that the transfer is not in the long-term interest of the Virginia Port Authority.
Title
Port Opportunity Fund; transfers to Fund, exception.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2016-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100967D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB394 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB394+hil |