VA HB400 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local school boards; policies permitting parents to observe children. Requires local school boards to adopt and implement policies that would ensure parents may observe in the child's classroom.
Title
School boards, local; policies permitting parents to observe children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-08 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 12-N) (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | House: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 12-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102849D |