VA HB401 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Compensation of court-appointed counsel; waivers. Allows court-appointed counsel for parents in child welfare cases to submit a waiver application for additional compensation of $120 in district court and $158 for cases appealed to the circuit court.
Title
Court-appointed counsel; additional compensation.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred from Education by voice vote |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102615D |