VA HB412 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666)
Summary
Wills and decedents' estates; order in which debts of decedents to be paid. Increases from $2,000 to $3,500 the amount available from the estate to pay funeral expenses when there are insufficient assets for the satisfaction of all demands against the estate. This bill is identical to SB 735.
Title
Decedents' estates; priority of debts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 666 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB412ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-02-28 | House: Delegates: Griffith, Kilgore, Valentine | |
2008-02-28 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Senators: Smith, Petersen, McEachin | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-02-26 | House: House acceded to request | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (2-Y 94-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Senate amendment rejected by House (2-Y 94-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (12-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-25 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-25 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-01-24 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-23 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080710520 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB412 |