VA HB42 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation programs; performance audit by Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC). Requires JLARC to administer a performance audit of the Commonwealth's transportation programs. JLARC shall issue an RFP to initiate the procurement process for a management consulting firm to conduct the audit. A final report on the findings of the performance audit shall be submitted to the Joint Commission on Transportation Accountability and the Governor no later than December 31, 2010.
Title
Transportation programs; JLARC to administer a performance audit, report.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Daniel Marshall [R] | Del. Glenn Oder [R] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] |
Del. Ron Villanueva [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 819 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB42ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB42ER) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB42H2 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 10105120D-H2 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee substitute from Transportation rejected 10104432D-H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105120D-H2 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | House: Assigned App. sub: Transportation | |
2010-02-02 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104432D-H1 | |
2010-02-02 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (16-Y 0-N) | |
2009-12-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2009-12-18 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100920D |
Same As/Similar To
SB201 (Same As) 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786)