VA HB429 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Telephone bills; blocking third-party charges. Prohibits a billing carrier from including in a customer's bill charges for products, goods, or services submitted by a service agent or service provider after the customer has requested the billing carrier to block such billings. Billing carriers are also prohibited from entering into agreements to bill for a service provider or billing agent with respect to a customer who has requested the billing carrier to block such billings. Finally, the measure provides that a customer is not liable for an amount charged through a billing carrier after the billing carrier has received and processed a request from the customer that the billing carrier block such billings. A customer may submit a request in writing, orally, or electronically.
Title
Telephone bills; blocking third-party charges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2012-02-07 | House | Continued to 2013 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2012-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-01-17 | House | Assigned C & L sub: #2 |
2012-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2012-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103723D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB429 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB429+hil |