VA HB442 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Career and technical education credentials; testing accommodations for English language learners. Requires the Department of Education to develop, maintain, and make available to each local school board a catalogue of the testing accommodations available to English language learners for each certification, examination, assessment, and battery that satisfies the career and technical education credential graduation requirement. The bill requires each local school board to develop and implement policies to require each high school principal or his designee to notify each English language learner of the availability of such testing accommodations prior to the student's participation in any such certification, examination, assessment, or battery. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2019.
Title
Career and technical education credentials; testing accommodations for English language learners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 139 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB442ER) |
2018-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB442H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105520D-H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105520D-H1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102028D |