VA HB505 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293)
Summary
Interagency Civil Admissions Advisory Council. Removes the sunset of July 1, 2008, thereby making the Council permanent.
Title
Interagency Civil Admissions Advisory Council; removes sunset provision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 293 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB505ER) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Assigned GL sub: FOIA | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081043528 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB505 |