VA HB518 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Passed by for the day - Governor's veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Passed by for the day - Governor's veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Local school boards; public school choice. Requires, notwithstanding any agreement, waiver from the federal government, or provision of law to the contrary, the Board of Education, effective starting with the 2017-2018 school year, to select 12 schools identified for comprehensive support and improvement and require such schools to provide all enrolled students with the option to transfer to another public school in the school division in accordance with relevant federal law and subject to certain conditions and limitations established by the relevant local school board. The bill will not become effective unless reenacted by the 2017 Session of the General Assembly, except that the Board of Education is directed to report on the costs of implementation of the bill to the relevant General Assembly committees.
Title
School boards, local; to provide students with option to transfer to another school division.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 14-N) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 59 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 59 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Passed by for the day - Governor's veto sustained |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-04-05 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB518ER) |
2016-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (24-Y 14-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 42-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 42-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB518H2 |
2016-02-04 | House | Substitute by Delegate LeMunyon agreed to 16105120D-H2 |
2016-02-04 | House | Committee substitute rejected 16104472D-H1 |
2016-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-04 | House | Floor substitute printed 16105120D-H2 (LeMunyon) |
2016-02-01 | House | Passed by until Thursday, February 4, 2016 |
2016-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104472D-H1 |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2016-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100787D |