VA HB566 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Standards of Quality; School Performance Report Card. Requires each local school board to include in its annual report to the Board of Education the number of Virginia workplace readiness skills assessments passed and the number of national occupational competency assessments passed. This number is in addition to the current related reporting requirements of the number of industry certifications obtained, state licensure examinations passed, and career and technical education completers who graduated. The bill requires each number to be reported as a separate category on the School Performance Report Card.
Title
Standards of Quality; local school board to include in its annual report.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Tata [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089) | |
2010-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 89 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-02-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB566ER) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB566H1 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104985D-H1 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104985D-H1 | |
2010-02-03 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103334D |
Same As/Similar To
SB630 (Same As) 2010-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0163)