VA HB579 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; records of federal animal welfare violations; limitation on fees. Prohibits any public body in custody of records that pertain to or were generated as a result of a violation of federal animal welfare regulations, policies, or guidelines from charging more than $25 for the production of such records regarding any one incident or one animal testing facility.
Title
VA Freedom of Information Act; records of federal animal welfare violations, limitation on fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Procurement/Open Government |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104558D |