VA HB582 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0783)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0783)
Summary
Psychiatric inpatient treatment of minors; timing of petition and hearing. Increases from 72 hours to 96 hours the length of time (i) to hold a hearing for the involuntary commitment of a minor or the emergency admission of a minor for inpatient treatment, and (ii) that a minor may be admitted by his parents to a facility over his objections. The bill also provides that the time to hold the involuntary commitment hearing runs from the issuance of the temporary detention order or the filing of the petition for such hearing, whichever occurs later. The bill provides further that a petition for judicial approval of the admission of a minor by his parents over his objections shall be filed no sooner than 24 hours and no later than 96 hours after his admission. This bill is identical to
Title
Psychiatric inpatient treatment of minors; timing of petition and hearing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0783) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 783 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB582ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 089604228-S1 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB582S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 089604228-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 089604228-S1 | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-31 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-31 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB582H1 | |
2008-01-30 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081470432-H1 | |
2008-01-30 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-29 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-29 | House: Substitute bill reprinted 081470432-H1 | |
2008-01-28 | House: Committee substitute printed 081470432-H1 | |
2008-01-25 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081433432 |
Same As/Similar To
SB276 (Same As) 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB582 |