VA HB600 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child welfare mandates. Imposes certain mandates related to the protection and encouragement of children, including a requirement that certain information and options be given to a child in connection with foster care plans, the imposition of certain age-appropriate restrictions, and requirements of both the courts and the Department of Social Services regarding foster care plans. The bill adds to the definition of abused or neglected child any child who has been identified as a victim of sex trafficking or severe forms of trafficking as defined by the federal law.
Title
Child welfare; imposes certain mandates related to protection and encouragement of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 631 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-08 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB600ER) |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Printed as engrossed 16101843D-E |
2016-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB600E |
2016-02-08 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101843D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 281 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 282.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 905.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 905.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 908 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |