VA HB632 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0410)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0410)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; request for removal of officer of election. Authorizes an electoral board member to request in writing the removal of an officer of election whom he knows to be the spouse, parent, grandparent, sibling, child, or grandchild of a candidate in that election. Currently, only a candidate may require the removal of an officer of election for these grounds by a request in writing. The substitute officer holds office and serves only for that election.
Title
Elections; substitution of officers of election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0410) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 410 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB632ER) |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-04 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 14103152D-E |
2014-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB632E |
2014-02-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103152D |