VA HB690 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Immunity of persons at public hearing; attorney fees; costs. Allows the court to award reasonable attorney fees and costs in any suit dismissed pursuant to the immunity provided to an individual at a public hearing, or where a nonsuit is taken.
Title
Immunity of persons at public hearing; attorney fees and costs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2016-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1117-Loupassi) by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101405D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1117 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0239)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB690 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB690+hil |