VA HB709 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child abuse and neglect investigations; time for determination. Provides for an extension of the time period during which a local department of social services must determine if a report of child abuse or neglect is founded from 60 to 90 days in cases in which the investigation is being conducted in cooperation with a law-enforcement agency and both parties agree that circumstances so warrant.
Title
Child abuse and neglect investigations; time for determination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 504 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB709ER) |
2014-03-17 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-06 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Favola, Barker, Wagner |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Delegates: Gilbert, Bell, R.B., BaCote |
2014-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-03-04 | House | House acceded to request |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (1-Y 98-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB709H1 |
2014-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104213D-H1 |
2014-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104213D-H1 |
2014-01-23 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102942D |