VA HB777 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669)
Summary
Commission on Civics Education. Extends the sunset provision applicable to the Commission from July 1, 2008, to July 1, 2010. This bill is identical to
Title
Civics Education, Commission on; extends sunset provision.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Tata [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 669 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB777ER) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-21 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-17 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-15 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084044748 |
Same As/Similar To
SB306 (Same As) 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB777 |