VA HB822 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Renewable energy portfolio standard program. Limits the ability of an electric utility participating in the renewable energy portfolio standard (RPS) program to bank renewable energy sales or renewable energy certificates (RECs) that are in excess of the yearly sales requirement for that RPS Goal. The measure provides that the utility may use such excess sales or RECs to achieve the RPS Goals only in the subsequent five calendar years after the renewable energy was generated or the certificates were created. An electric utility may continue to apply RECs that it acquired prior to January 1, 2014.
Title
Electric utility regulation; renewable energy portfolio standard program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N 2-A) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N 2-A) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 420 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB822ER) |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N 2-A) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 2-N 2-A) |
2014-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB822H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104604D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104604D-H1 |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103290D |
Same As/Similar To
SB498 (Same As) 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)