VA HB849 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Limitation on sentence upon revocation of suspension of sentence; technical violations; penalty. Provides that a court may impose not more than 30 days of active incarceration upon a first technical violation of the terms and conditions of a suspended sentence or probation and may impose not more than 90 days of active incarceration for a second technical violation. Under current law, the court is prohibited from imposing active incarceration for a first technical violation and there is a presumption against imposing a sentence of a term of active incarceration; however, if the court finds, by a preponderance of the evidence, that the defendant committed the violation and he cannot be safely diverted from active incarceration through less restrictive means, the court may impose not more than 14 days of active incarceration.
Title
Limitation on sentence upon revocation of suspension of sentence; technical violations.
Sponsors
Del. Will Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104763D |