VA HB917 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Kinship Guardianship Assistance program; eligibility; fictive kin. Expands eligibility for the Kinship Guardianship Assistance program by allowing payments to be made to fictive kin who receive custody of a child of whom they had been the foster parent.
Title
Kinship Guardianship Assistance program; expands eligibility, fictive kin.
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Brewer [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB933-Carroll Foy) by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100619D |
Same As/Similar To
HB933 (Similar To) 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0366)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 900.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB917 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB917+hil |