VA HB921 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; cost sharing for breast examinations. Prohibits health insurance carriers from imposing cost sharing for diagnostic breast examinations and supplemental breast examinations, as those terms are defined in the bill, under certain insurance policies, subscription contracts, and health care plans delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed in the Commonwealth on and after January 1, 2025. The bill provides that such examinations include examinations using diagnostic mammography, breast magnetic resonance imaging, or breast ultrasound.
Title
Health insurance; cost sharing for breast examinations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Incorporated by Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB230-Simonds) by voice vote |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103570D |
Same As/Similar To
HB230 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Continued to 2025 in Appropriations by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB921 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB921+hil |