VA HB967 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enacted, Chapter 826 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enacted, Chapter 826 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; fee disclosure statement. Requires landlords subject to the Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act to include on the first page of a written rental agreement, in bold, 14-point type, a description of any rent and fees to be charged to the tenant. The bill requires that such rental agreement also contain, in bold, 14-point type: No fee shall be collected unless it is listed below.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; fee disclosure statement.
Sponsors
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Irene Shin [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bennett-Parker [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] |
Del. Rozia Henson [D] | Del. Marty Martinez [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 826 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB967ER2) |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 47-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (52-Y 47-N) |
2024-04-08 | House | Governor's substitute printed 24109287D-H2 |
2024-04-08 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB967ER) |
2024-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-12 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB967H1 |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107208D-H1 |
2024-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107208D-H1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (10-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24105065D |
Same As/Similar To
SB405 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Enacted, Chapter 788 (effective 7/1/24)