VA HB997 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Proceedings for the removal and relocation of human remains. Provides that should any locality having acquired by any means land on which an abandoned graveyard is located, including lands acquired in accordance with § 22.1-126.1 for educational purposes, initiate plans to use that land for purposes other than to maintain the graveyard, such locality shall, prior to completion of said plans, develop and engage in active public notice and participation regarding efforts to avoid adverse impacts to the graveyard or to remove the remains interred in such graveyard to an alternative repository. The bill provides that such notice and participation shall include, at minimum, publication of at least one notice in a local newspaper of general circulation, notice posted at the site of the graveyard, and notice to and consultation with any historic preservation or other such commission, as well as area historical and genealogical societies, and at least one public hearing, and notice to the Department of Historic Resources (Department) and any local historical commission or organization. In addition, if a locality has acquired land on which an abandoned cemetery or gravesite of Virginians held as slaves at the time of their deaths is located, the locality must notify the Department of the location of such cemetery or gravesite. The Department shall maintain as a public record a listing of all locations of all abandoned cemeteries and gravesites of Virginians held as slaves at the time of their deaths that have been submitted to the Department.
Title
Cemeteries; procedure for removal and relocation of human remains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 588 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB997ER) |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105290D-S1 (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB997S1 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105290D-S1 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105290D-S1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB997H1 |
2014-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104521D-H1 |
2014-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104521D-H1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103431D |