VA HJR2 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (second resolution); right to work. Provides that any agreement or combination between any employer and any labor union or labor organization whereby persons not members of such union or organization are denied the right to work for the employer, or whereby such membership is made a condition of employment or continuation of employment by such employer, or whereby any such union or organization acquires an employment monopoly in any enterprise, is against public policy and constitutes an illegal combination or conspiracy and is void.
Title
Constitutional amendment; right to work (second reference).
Sponsors
Del. Richard Bell [R] | Del. Thomas Greason [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] |
Del. Charles Poindexter [R] | Del. Roxann Robinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733) | |
2016-04-10 | House | Assigned Chapter 733 (effective 7/1/16) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ2ER) |
2016-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reading waived |
2016-02-02 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 34-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Agreed to by House (65-Y 34-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-02-02 | House | Taken up |
2016-01-29 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 7-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-11-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100588D |