VA HJR381 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ381ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ381ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Betty Morgan Incorminias.
Title
Celebrating the life of Betty Morgan Incorminias.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ381ER) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Received |
2014-03-03 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 14105216D |
2014-03-03 | House | Agreed to by House |
2014-03-03 | House | Engrossed by House |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed by until Monday, March 3, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14105216D |