VA HJR59 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; facial recognition; artificial intelligence; report. Directs the Joint Commission on Technology and Science to convene a working group of relevant agencies, law enforcement, private industry, and academics to study the proliferation and implementation of facial recognition and artificial intelligence. The Commission shall make recommendations and report its findings no later than the first day of the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Facial recognition and artificial intelligence technology; Joint Com. on Science & Tech to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101478D |