VA HJR609 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; SCC; management of continuing care retirement communities and the need for resident representation in management and governance; report. Requests the State Corporation Commission to study the management, governance, and financial structure of continuing care retirement communities and the need for resident representation in management and governance, including the need for and any benefits associated with requiring resident participation in management and governance of continuing care retirement communities. If the SCC determines that a need exists and benefits would result from requiring resident participation in management and governance of continuing care retirement communities, the SCC is further directed to study and make recommendations related to the best method for implementing such requirement, including any statutory or regulatory changes that may be required.
Title
Continuing care retirement communities; SCC to study management & need for resident representation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Rules | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103655D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HJ609 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HJ609+hil |