VA HJR627 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ627ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ627ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Virginia CyberSlam.
Title
Commending Virginia CyberSlam.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Irene Shin [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ627ER) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Received |
2023-02-13 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2023-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House |
2023-02-07 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 23104466D |