VA HJR754 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ754ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ754ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
400th anniversary of landmark events in Virginia in 2019. Designates the Jamestown-Yorktown Foundation as the official Executive Branch agency to assist the Commonwealth in establishing planning systems for commemorating in 2019 the 400th anniversary of landmark events in Virginia's history.
Title
Jamestown-Yorktown Foundation; to assist in planning 400th anniversary of landmark events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ754ER) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reading waived |
2013-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 13104190D-E |
2013-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HJ754E |
2013-01-25 | House | Amendment by Delegate Jones agreed to |
2013-01-25 | House | Taken up |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13104190D |