VA SB1019 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0680)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0680)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land preservation tax credit. Makes several changes to the land preservation tax credit by (i) reducing the maximum amount of tax credits that may be issued in each calendar year from $100 million to $75 million beginning in 2015; (ii) with the exception of credits issued for fee simple interest donations, reducing the maximum amount of the land preservation tax credit that may be claimed in any year from $100,000 in taxable year 2014 to $20,000 in taxable years 2015 and 2016 and $50,000 for each taxable year thereafter; (iii) requiring that a complete application for the tax credit with regard to a conveyance be filed with the Department of Taxation by December 31 of the year following the calendar year of the conveyance; and (iv) prohibiting the Department of Taxation from issuing any tax credit for a donation from any allocation or pool of tax credits attributable to a calendar year prior to the year in which the complete tax credit application for the donation was filed.
Title
Land preservation; tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0680) | |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 680 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1019ER) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Title replaced 15105021D-H1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Passed House with substitute (96-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1019H1 |
2015-02-16 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105021D-H1 |
2015-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105021D-H1 |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1019S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104245D-S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104245D-S1 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101926D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1828 (Same As) 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235)