VA SB1046 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0945)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0945)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clinical social workers; patient records; involuntary detention orders. Adds clinical social workers to the list of eligible providers that includes treating physicians and clinical psychologists who can disclose or recommend the withholding of patient records, face a malpractice review panel, and provide recommendations on involuntary temporary detention orders.
Title
Clinical social workers; patient records, involuntary detention orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0945) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 945 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1046ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104401D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 340.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 127.1:03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 608 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 40.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2969 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 581.20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |