VA SB1061 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0179)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Real Estate Board; real estate licenses. Clarifies that the Real Estate Board (the Board) may establish criteria delineating the permitted activities of unlicensed individuals employed by, or affiliated as an independent contractor with, real estate licensees or under the supervision of a real estate broker. Current law only permits the Board to establish such criteria for unlicensed individuals employed by or under the supervision of a real estate broker. The bill also specifies that a real estate team may hire one or more unlicensed assistants as an employee or an independent contractor. Current law does not specify the method by which real estate teams may hire independent contractors. Finally, the bill permits an independent contractor affiliated with a disabled or deceased broker to carry on the business of the disabled or deceased broker for 180 days following the death or disability of the broker solely for the purpose of concluding the business of the deceased or disabled broker under certain circumstances. The bill contains a technical amendment and is identical to HB 2352.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Estate Board; real estate licensees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0179)
2019-02-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 179 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1061ER)
2019-02-14SenateEnrolled
2019-02-12SenateTitle replaced 19106381D-H1
2019-02-12SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1061H1
2019-02-08HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106381D-H1
2019-02-08HouseRead third time
2019-02-07HouseRead second time
2019-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106381D-H1
2019-02-05HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-22HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-18SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
2018-12-07SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-12-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101457D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412105(n/a)See Bill Text
5412106.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5412108.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1061
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1061+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1061H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1061ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0179+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0010+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0027SB1061+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0068SB1061+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0236+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2571+SB1061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0512SB1061+SB1061

Bill Comments

feedback