VA SB1091 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (13-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (13-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local participation in risk management plan. Provides that participation by constitutional officers in the Department of the Treasury's risk management plan shall be determined by the local governing body of the locality served by the officers rather than by the State Compensation Board. Also, local governments and constitutional officers choosing not to participate in the risk management plan shall not be subject to payment of any premium or administrative costs.
Title
Risk management plan; local participation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-31 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100849D |